THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:37:08 AM
Gamble, David Gregory
CPSO#:
72399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
IPAC
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 8076846000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:09 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GREGORY GAMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1998 |