THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:30:22 PM
Kester-Greene, Nicole Maree
CPSO#:
72393
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kester, Nicole Maree (used until: 13 Jul 1998 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview St
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE MAREE KESTER-GREENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTER-GREENE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |