THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:21:51 AM
Barrett, Jeffrey Robert
CPSO#:
72385
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON N0H 2T0
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2001 |