THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:16:30 PM
Kawun, Ulana Bohdanka
CPSO#:
72378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: McMaster University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-7338
Fax: (416) 283-4083
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ULANA BOHDANKA KAWUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2004 |