THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:44:54 PM
Dinniwell, Robert Edward
CPSO#:
72375
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-682-6151
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD DINNIWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNIWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2005 |