THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:48:16 PM
Fraser, Douglas Dale
CPSO#:
72361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Critical Care Medicine
Room C2-C82
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8052
Fax: (519) 685-8766
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS DALE FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |