THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:03:44 AM
Tam, Eric Siu Lung
CPSO#:
72341
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street
Unit 401
Brampton ON L6Y 0P6
Phone: 416-292-0330 Ext. 1
Fax: 416-292-0331
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC SIU LUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2021 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2022 |