THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:05:25 PM
Petrisor, Bradley Allan
CPSO#:
72335
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
1280 Main Street West
5 North - Room 529
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44648
Fax: (905) 523-6776
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British West Indies
Northwest Territories
Uganda
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALLAN PETRISOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRISOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2003 |