THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:46:50 AM
Milankov, Kosta
CPSO#:
72327
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Macedonian
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1101 Kingston Road, Suite 220
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 831-9797
Fax: (905) 839-9984
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KOSTA MILANKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILANKOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2000 |