THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:03:29 PM
Wald, Rachel Maya
CPSO#:
72307
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Dayan-Wald, Rachel Maya (used until: 22 Nov 2007 )
Dayan, Rachel Maya (used until: 02 May 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Room 5N 517
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5502
Fax: (416) 340-5014
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:22 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL MAYA WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2002 |