THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:44:30 PM
Granton, Jeffrey Thomas
CPSO#:
72305
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
LHSC - University Campus
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY THOMAS GRANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2003 |