THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:20:44 PM
Aleyaseen, Maryam
CPSO#:
72288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501-95 Bayly St W
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: 9056868679
Fax: 9056864324
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM ALEYASEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEYASEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2004 |