THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:08:30 AM
Jocic, Dragana Anna
CPSO#:
72270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: McMaster University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
701 Main St. West
Suite 100
Hamilton ON L8S 1A2
Phone: (289)768 7246
Fax: (289)779 2273
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dragana Anna Jocic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DRAGANA ANNA JOCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOCIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2000 |