THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:42:17 AM
Murray, Christian Alexander
CPSO#:
72250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room 5142
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7732
Fax: (416) 323-6306
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN ALEXANDER MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2004 |