THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:42:40 AM
Maranda, Julie Patricia
CPSO#:
72244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury & District General
Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 31000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE PATRICIA MARANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANDA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2000 |