THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:54:37 AM
Amjad, Asma
CPSO#:
72208
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Ottawa, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A-2
1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 680-6420
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASMA AMJAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 06 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2001 |