THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:51:25 AM
Hammett, David Clayton
CPSO#:
72189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1150 Franklin Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7J2
Phone: 8072190521
Electoral District: 03
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Effective April 30, 2021 Contact above for records
Sunset Country Family Health Team
45 Wolsley Ave
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
807 468 6321
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 10, 2019, Lake of the Woods District Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective July 10, 2019, terms and conditions were imposed on Dr. Hammett's reappointment to active staff of Lake of the Woods District Hospital for the 2019/2020 credentialing year.
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 5, 2012
Expiry Date: April 30, 2012
Summary:
The College received notice from Lake of the Woods District Hospital that Dr. David C. Hammett's anesthesiology privileges were temporarily suspended from February 5, 2012 to April 30, 2012.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CLAYTON HAMMETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2000 |