THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:12:35 AM
Byles, Nancy Islay Anne
CPSO#:
72156
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
180 Parsons Road
Unit 40
New Tecumseth ON L9R 1E8
Phone: 1-705-435-6225
Fax: 1-705-481-1328
Electoral District: 00
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:13 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NANCY ISLAY ANNE BYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BYLES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1998 to 26 Jun 1998
EL - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Jun 1998 to 24 Jul 1998
EL - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2002 |