THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:33:27 PM
James, Paula Denise
CPSO#:
72135
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Room 2015 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 533-6329
Fax: (613) 533-6855
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULA DENISE JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 May 1998 to 29 May 1998
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 May 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2000 |