THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:49:03 AM
Laviolette, Eric Leopold
CPSO#:
72100
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital General Hawkesbury
1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 188
Fax: (613) 636-6171
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Feb 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC LEOPOLD LAVIOLETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVIOLETTE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2019 |