THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:48:05 AM
Kingdom, John Charles Peter
CPSO#:
72096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586 8808 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 586-3216
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Maternal Fetal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES PETER KINGDOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINGDOM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1998 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 1998 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2003 |