THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:45:53 AM
Elford, Kimberly Joy-Ann
CPSO#:
72082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4303 Village Centre Crt
Mississauga ON L4Z 1S2
Phone: 9059496999
Fax: 9059496908
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOY-ANN ELFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Feb 1998 to 03 Apr 1998
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Ottawa, 09 Jun 1999 to 29 Jun 1999
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2002 to 01 Mar 2002
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |