THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:34:45 PM
MacKenzie, Mary Jean Frances
CPSO#:
72071
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: 519 631 2030
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY JEAN FRANCES MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1998 to 04 Mar 1998
EL - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Mar 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2001 |