THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:33:43 AM
Ayad, Misaa Mustafa Sabri
CPSO#:
72068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-6250
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Aug 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MISAA MUSTAFA SABRI AYAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2000 to 13 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2001 to 13 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |