THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:11:22 AM
Yegappan, Muthulakshmi
CPSO#:
72064
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014
Corporation Name: C. & M. Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 14 Sep 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:08 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 11 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 09 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 4, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Muthulakshmi Yegappan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2022:
A College investigation was conducted into a complaint regarding Dr. Yegappan’s care of and conduct towards a patient in her office-based gynecology practice. During this investigation, Dr. Yegappan resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)