THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:27:01 PM
Forman, Rachel Alizon
CPSO#:
72020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Agincourt Professional Centre
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 317
Toronto ON M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 609-8868
Fax: (416) 609-8711
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL ALIZON FORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |