THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:24:11 AM
Ibrahim, Abdulmajid Saleh
CPSO#:
72008
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1st Floor
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-4922
Fax: (905) 721-6648
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:18 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULMAJID SALEH IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2001 |