THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:18:08 PM
Petroniene, Rima GI
CPSO#:
71994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian, Russian
Education: Kaunas Medical Institute, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
15 Gallie Court
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RIMA GI PETRONIENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRONIENE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 04 Nov 2002
CF - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |