THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:11:35 PM
Jaroszynski, Grzegorz
CPSO#:
71989
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 23A
2nd Floor
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 333-5020
Fax: (905) 333-5018
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRZEGORZ JAROSZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAROSZYNSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 1997 |