THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:45:24 AM
Lee, Marc Frederick
CPSO#:
71987
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1281 7th Street
Valdor QC J9P 3S1
Phone: (819) 825-2222
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Apr 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARC FREDERICK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |