THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:28:32 AM
Dasgupta, Monidipa Medicine Professional Corporation Monidipa
CPSO#:
71983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Geriatric Medicine
Room B9-103
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33922#
Fax: (519) 663-3472
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jan 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONIDIPA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION MONIDIPA DASGUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASGUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 May 1999
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2001 |