THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:44:52 PM
Bret, Patrice Marc Jacques
CPSO#:
71961
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite de Lyon I, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Patrice M. Bret Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The medical records can be retrieved from the hospitals at which patients were treated.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 Apr 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |