THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:31:27 AM
Ulic, Liliana
CPSO#:
71960
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West 3
569 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4529 Ext. 2242
Fax: (416) 447-8608
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Liliana Ulic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILIANA ULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jan 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1999 |