THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:48:57 AM
Bhardwaj, Divya
CPSO#:
71958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIVYA BHARDWAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARDWAJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2005 |