THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:39:07 PM
Smith, Patricia Anne
CPSO#:
71952
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Anne Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton
L8S 4K1
Date Received: 01 Jan 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 29 Jan 1999
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jan 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2022 |