THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:00:14 AM
Salasidis, Gary Chris
CPSO#:
71905
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Regional
Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6937
Fax: (519) 749-6492
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiothoracic Surgery |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY CHRIS SALASIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALASIDIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1998 |