THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:21:14 AM
Bodok, Rebecca
CPSO#:
71902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bodok-Nutzati, Rebecca (used until: 09 Sep 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 QUEEN STREET NORTH
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
Phone: (905) 951-1173
Fax: (905) 951-9716
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA BODOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1999 |