THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:29:06 PM
Ben Omran, Karima
CPSO#:
71893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON L6R 0X5
Phone: (905) 453-5789
Fax: (888) 248-1241
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:18 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARIMA BEN OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN OMRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 18 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)