THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:25:45 PM
Fraser-Roberts, Deborah Leigh
CPSO#:
71890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital, CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3591
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LEIGH FRASER-ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER-ROBERTS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 1997 to 22 Aug 1997
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1997 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 1997 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Aug 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2009 |