THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:42:37 AM
Taneja, Ravi
CPSO#:
71867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Armed Forces Medical College, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32846
Fax: (519) 663-2957
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVI TANEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANEJA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2009 |