THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:13:30 AM
Chan, Howard Ho Wai
CPSO#:
71846
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1165 Creditstone Road
Concord ON L4K4N7
Phone: 905-6690528
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Howard H.W. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:23 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOWARD HO WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2002 |