THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:27:49 AM
Yeung, Albert
CPSO#:
71842
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1030 - 28 South Unionville Ave
Markham ON L3R 4P9
Phone: (905) 604-5282
Fax: (905) 604-5283
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:06 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALBERT YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Jul 1997 to 24 Aug 1997
EL - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |