THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:22:59 PM
Alghamdi, Ahmed Saeed Dammas
CPSO#:
71835
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
72-VICTORIA AVENUE
Chatham ON N7L 3A1
Phone: (519) 397-0790
Fax: (519)397-5535
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alghamdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 12 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED SAEED DAMMAS ALGHAMDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALGHAMDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 16 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 16 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 16 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Aug 2001
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |