THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:17:34 AM
Hejjaji, Hana Elmehdi
CPSO#:
71820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 3941
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANA ELMEHDI HEJJAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEJJAJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2001 |