THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:21:31 AM
Husien, Mohamed Elhadi Mohamed
CPSO#:
71809
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106A
525 Belmont Ave W.
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Elhadi Husien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ELHADI MOHAMED HUSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSIEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |