THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:37:44 AM
Al-Hajri, Munirah Abdullah Ibrahim
CPSO#:
71793
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
650-25 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 6S6
Phone: 4162254440
Fax: 4166409454
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jul 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUNIRAH ABDULLAH IBRAHIM AL-HAJRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAJRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2007 |