THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:12:46 AM
Bengezi, Omar Abdalla
CPSO#:
71787
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 105-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705 503-6333
Fax: 705 503 3336
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:11 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR ABDALLA BENGEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENGEZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2004 |