THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:55:16 PM
Al-Omran, Mohammed A M
CPSO#:
71781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 7-074 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6047
Fax: (416) 864-6012
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:02 Jul 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:07 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED A M AL-OMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-OMRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |