THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:00:15 AM
Mikhail, Roland Girgis
CPSO#:
71763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Ave
Suite 201
Windsor, Ontario
N8X3V6
Windsor ON N8X 1J9
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROLAND GIRGIS MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |