THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:16:09 PM
Faidi, Samir Abdelmagid
CPSO#:
71753
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
HHS - General Site
237 Barton Street East
6North Room 614
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44736
Fax: 905-523-5889
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMIR ABDELMAGID FAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAIDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2004 |